NH HB234 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-191 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to renewable energy credits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to renewable energy credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 177 N: 167 NV: 21 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Reconsider (Y: 178 N: 169 NV: 19 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - ITL (Y: 170 N: 176 NV: 19 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 177 N: 167 NV: 28 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Reconsider (Y: 178 N: 169 NV: 25 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - ITL (Y: 170 N: 176 NV: 25 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 182 NV: 17 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 182 NV: 17 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 193-191 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 198
2023-03-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2023-03-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB234-FN 03/22/2023 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar)
2023-03-16HouseExecutive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-02-27HouseDivision Work Session: 03/02/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2023-02-24HouseReferred to Finance 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 38
2023-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-167 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 36
2023-02-24HouseReconsider Ought to Pass (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-169 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 34
2023-02-24HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-176 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 32
2023-02-24HouseReconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 176-169 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 32
2023-02-23HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 176-170 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 32
2023-02-15HouseLay HB234 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 346-20 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 19
2023-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 183-184 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 19
2023-02-15HouseLay HB234 on Table (Rep. McWilliams): Motion Failed DV 182-184 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 19
2023-02-15HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 182-182 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 19
2023-02-14HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Failed DV 179-182 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 55
2023-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 02/03/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13
2023-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 02/03/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 01/31/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-01-18HouseExecutive Session: 01/24/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-01-18House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/23/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=401&sy=2023&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2023&id=405&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=9&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=9&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=46&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=47&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=48&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=46&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=47&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0401
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=48&sy=2023&lb=H&eb=HB0234&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2023&txtbillnumber=HB234&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0401

Bill Comments

feedback