NH HB234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an exemption from business taxes for media production companies engaged in business in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing an exemption from business taxes for media production companies engaged in business in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Edith Tucker [D] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Reed Panasiti [R] |
Sen. Harold French [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 25 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 14 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 42 |