NH HB233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 @ 2:30 pm in Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback