NH HB233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 14; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 14; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the submission of school emergency response plans.
Title
Relative to the submission of school emergency response plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 14; Eff. 6/16/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/07/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 4 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/02/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2017-01-12 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-12-29 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 21 |