NH HB231 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to workplace lactation rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to workplace lactation rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 9
2021-02-03HouseExecutive Session: 02/11/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98476278055
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/28/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96195399441 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback