NH HB230 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB230

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the department of agriculture, markets, and food to employ an electronic data processing system for all registrations under its purview.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the department of agriculture, markets, and food to employ an electronic data processing system for all registrations under its purview.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-12HouseDivision Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37
2023-03-23HouseRetained in Committee
2023-03-16HouseExecutive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2023-02-23HouseDivision Work Session: 03/03/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2023-02-16HouseDivision Work Session: 02/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2023-02-02HouseReferred to Finance 02/02/2023 House Journal 4
2023-02-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4
2023-01-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 01/18/23 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7
2023-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/18/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 7

Same As/Similar To

HB230 (Carry Over) 2023-09-12 - Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 House Calendar 37

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback