NH HB230 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB230

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to child day care monitoring visits, requirements for child day care providers, and the appeals process for child day care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to child day care monitoring visits, requirements for child day care providers, and the appeals process for child day care providers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-08HouseExecutive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
2021-10-25HouseExecutive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
2021-09-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2021-03-11HouseRetained in Committee
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 40

Same As/Similar To

HB230 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback