NH HB230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 224; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 224; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the discharge of a mortgage.
Title
Relative to the discharge of a mortgage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 224; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1838s (Reps Hunt, Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1838s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1838s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1838s, New Title, 5/28/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0966h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG. 1289-1290 |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment #0966h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG. 1289-1290 |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0966h for Mar 25 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 23, PG. 632 |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 506 |
2015-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 18 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 244 |
2015-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-20 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 213 |