NH HB230 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13, Pg.264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13, Pg.264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the repair of certain structures from compensatory mitigation requirements.
Title
Exempting the repair of certain structures from compensatory mitigation requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13, Pg.264 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-16 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.418 | |
2011-02-15 | House Special Order to Feb 16: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 17, PG.378 | |
2011-02-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 13, PG.236 | |
2011-02-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 15 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.236 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/8/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 11, PG. 178 |