NH HB230 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0289
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0289
Summary
Relative to the definition of abuse in domestic violence cases.
Title
Relative to the definition of abuse in domestic violence cases.
Sponsors
Rep. David Nixon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0289 | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2394 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2394 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | House Conference Committee Report #2195 Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2195; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2195; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2010-05-24 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/25/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Lasky, Reynolds and Roberge; Senate Journal 20, Pg.648 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Reynolds Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.648 | |
2010-04-14 | House Speaker Appoints Reps Chandley, Stevens, Welch & Shurtleff; House Journal 32, PG.1587 | |
2010-04-14 | House House Non Concurs w/Senate Amendment#0328s(NT), Req Comm of Conf (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1587 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 4, Pg.56 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0328s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.51 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Sen. Reynolds Floor Amendment 0328s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Committee Amendment 0199s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment 0199s, 1/27/10; Senate Calendar 4 pg. 6 | |
2009-06-03 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.503 | |
2009-06-03 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special-Order HB 230 to the front of the Calendar; Senate Journal 18, Pg.398 | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Committee Report; Rereferred to Committee [06/03/09]; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Hearing; May 12 , 2009, Room 103, State House, 03:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8, pg. 133 | |
2009-03-11 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0291h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.785 | |
2009-03-11 | House Amendment #0291h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.785 | |
2009-03-03 | House Proposed Amendment #0291h; House Calendar 19, PG.532-533 | |
2009-03-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0291h for Mar 11 Consent Calendar (vote 20-0); House Calendar 19, PG.500 | |
2009-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/17/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-01-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/29/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.220 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=391&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |