NH HB229 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to shared facilities and homeless shelters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to shared facilities and homeless shelters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/02/2017 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5
2017-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/19/2017 Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-29HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback