NH HB229 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to increasing the maximum amount of the optional veterans tax credit.
Title
Relative to increasing the maximum amount of the optional veterans tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-08-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 213 |