NH HB227 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB227
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to termination of tenancy at the expiration of the tenancy or lease term.
Title
Relative to termination of tenancy at the expiration of the tenancy or lease term.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/27/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0361h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-147 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 102 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment # 2021-0361h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 102 |
2021-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0361h (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 51 |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91233802944 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB227 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15