NH HB227 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eminent domain on public lands.
Title
Relative to eminent domain on public lands.
Sponsors
Rep. James Belanger [R] | Rep. Janice Gardner [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] | Rep. James Coffey [R] |
Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. June Frazer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Little Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0362h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22. PG. 563 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment #0362h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 563 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0362h for Mar 4 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 348 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 213 |