NH HB227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0031; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0031; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to property and casualty insurance.
Title
Relative to property and casualty insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0031; Effective 7/26/2014 |
2014-05-14 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1579eba Adopted Voice Vote (In recess from 4/30/14) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1579e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/14, Room 101 Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2298h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopt Amendment 2298h Amendment Adopted Div 263-13 |
2014-01-09 | House | Removed from Consent Calandar (Rep. Ley) |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2298h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2013-10-09 | House | ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-10-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-09-10 | House | ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-05-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302==RECESSED== |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 9:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/30/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.187 |