NH HB227 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2298h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2298h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to property and casualty insurance.
Title
Relative to property and casualty insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2298h for Jan 8 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-09 | House | ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-10-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-09-10 | House | ==Cancelled==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-05-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302==RECESSED== |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 9:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/30/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.187 |