NH HB225 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting the use of currency that could be detrimental to privacy rights.
Title
Relative to prohibiting the use of currency that could be detrimental to privacy rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 7 |
Same As/Similar To
HB225 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee