NH HB225 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to information collection concerning electric renewable portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to information collection concerning electric renewable portfolio standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study
2017-06-01SenateSen. Daniels Moved to Vacate HB 225-FN from Finance to Energy and Natural Resources, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-24SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/31/2017; Senate Calendar 25
2017-05-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1696s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1696s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1696s, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23
2017-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2017, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 18
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0436h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 73
2017-03-09HouseAmendment #2017-0436h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 73
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Harrington): Motion Failed DV 47-284 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 73
2017-03-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Harrington) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7
2017-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0436h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/14/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-01-25House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 02:00 PM Representatives Hall
2017-01-11House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2016-12-29HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback