NH HB224 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 185; Eff: 10/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 185; Eff: 10/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tinted windows on motor vehicles, relative to civil liability for damage to highways, and relative to employer access to motor vehicle records.
Title
Relative to tinted windows on motor vehicles, relative to civil liability for damage to highways, and relative to employer access to motor vehicle records.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
Rep. Travis O'Hara [R] | Rep. Cody Belanger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 200 N: 167 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 185; Eff: 10/09/2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2067EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06-24-2021 House Journal 11 |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2067e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-1990c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1990c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-1990c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Ricciardi, Watters; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1782s and Requests CofC (Reps. Walsh, Gagne, Hill, Pickering): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1782s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2021-1782s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 224 from the Consent Calendar; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25A |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 01:45 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0446h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-167 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment # 2021-0446h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0446h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 60 |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98257633759 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92807074926 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 39 |