NH HB222 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-162 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-162 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To require the use of seat belts during the operation of motor vehicles.
Title
To require the use of seat belts during the operation of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Veilleux [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] |
Rep. George Sykes [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 206 N: 162 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 206 N: 162 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - ITL (Y: 206 N: 162 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-162 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 69 |
2023-03-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB222-FN 03/07/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 18 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 7 |