NH HB222 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to official cover plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to official cover plates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A
2021-03-11SenateRemote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0224h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 19
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0224h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 19
2021-02-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0224h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 13
2021-01-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92807074926
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99305477189 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback