NH HB219 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing RSA 332-J regarding athlete agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing RSA 332-J regarding athlete agents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
2021-02-11HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback