NH HB218 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing RSA 320 relative to hawkers and peddlers and RSA 321 relative to itinerant vendors.
Title
Repealing RSA 320 relative to hawkers and peddlers and RSA 321 relative to itinerant vendors.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Yokela [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0256h: Motion Adopted DV 202-165 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 66 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment # 2021-0256h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 66 |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0256h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 44 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB218 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17