NH HB218 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing RSA 320 relative to hawkers and peddlers and RSA 321 relative to itinerant vendors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing RSA 320 relative to hawkers and peddlers and RSA 321 relative to itinerant vendors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-19SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25
2021-04-14SenateRemote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0256h: Motion Adopted DV 202-165 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 66
2021-04-08HouseAmendment # 2021-0256h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 66
2021-03-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0256h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 44
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback