NH HB218 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting interference with access to medical services and health insurance of New Hampshire citizens.
Title
Prohibiting interference with access to medical services and health insurance of New Hampshire citizens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 6 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.154-155 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.187 |