NH HB216 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 07/02/2013; Chapter 0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of the title "fire marshal."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of the title "fire marshal."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-03HouseSigned by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 07/02/2013; Chapter 0173
2013-04-24HouseEnrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257
2013-04-18SenateEnrolled
2013-04-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg;
2013-04-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2013-03-06SenateHearing: 3/13/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11
2013-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 6
2013-02-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.301
2013-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.150
2013-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.187

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback