NH HB210 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB210
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing exemptions under the interest and dividends tax and decreasing the total amount of research and development credits against business taxes.
Title
Increasing exemptions under the interest and dividends tax and decreasing the total amount of research and development credits against business taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Russell Ober [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Gregg Hough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99928276230 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92120368845 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB210 (Carry Over) 2021-08-18 - ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.