NH HB210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to civil actions against public officials in cities or towns.
Title
Relative to civil actions against public officials in cities or towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 123 N: 222 NV: 37 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73 |
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 226-121 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Failed Regular Calendar 123-222 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 70 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0045h: Amendment Adopted DV 219-108 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 70 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for 02/14/2019 (Vote 9-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 41 |