NH HB208 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 8; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing RSA 323 regarding lightning rod dealers and salesmen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing RSA 323 regarding lightning rod dealers and salesmen.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 8; Eff: 01/01/2022
2021-04-12SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
2021-04-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 99
2021-03-25SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-10SenateRemote Hearing: 03/17/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback