NH HB208 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-150 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-150 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the justified use of deadly force upon another person.
Title
Relative to the justified use of deadly force upon another person.
Sponsors
Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Rep. William Fowler [R] | Rep. Dan Davis [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - ITL (Y: 200 N: 150 NV: 16 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-150 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 96 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 23 |
2019-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-09 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 41 |