NH HB207 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 38; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 38; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school district unanticipated funds.
Title
Relative to school district unanticipated funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Plett [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 38; Eff: 07/18/2023 |
2023-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/11/2023); Senate Journal 15 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/16/2023 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10 |
2023-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-05 | House | Vacated and Referred to Finance (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2023 House Journal 2 P. 27 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Education |