NH HB205 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Lay HB205 on Table (Rep. Renzullo): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Lay HB205 on Table (Rep. Renzullo): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to testing private wells.
Title
Relative to testing private wells.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Dennis Malloy [D] |
Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Peggy Balboni [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Lay HB205 on Table (Rep. Renzullo): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 40 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/08/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 41 |
2023-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2023 02:35 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |