NH HB204 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 229-118 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 229-118 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Proclaiming January 24 as "Granny D" day.
Title
Proclaiming January 24 as "Granny D" day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted DV 229-118 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB204 11/15/2021 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 31 |
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2021 01:15 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97378434787Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB204 (Carry Over) 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=366&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB204 |