NH HB200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to an employer's burden of proof in unemployment compensation hearings.
Title
Relative to an employer's burden of proof in unemployment compensation hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Hearing: 3/19/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced 2/14/2013 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0263h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.464-465 |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment #0263h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.464-465 |
2013-02-14 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0263h; House Calendar 15, PG.292-293 |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0263h for Feb 20 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.265 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.186 |