NH HB196 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adding trespass as an exception to the charge of criminal threatening.
Title
Adding trespass as an exception to the charge of criminal threatening.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 159 NV: 9 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 203 N: 164 NV: 9 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 203 N: 164 NV: 9 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25A |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/10/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0758h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-159 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 143 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0758h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 203-164 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 143 |
2021-03-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0758h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 35 |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 03:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96477061090 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 38 |
Same As/Similar To
HB196 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17