NH HB194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 20; Eff: 07/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the release of student assessment information and data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the release of student assessment information and data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 193 N: 152 NV: 13 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 193 N: 152 NV: 18 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 20; Eff: 07/05/2021
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/22/2021); Senate Journal 13
2021-04-29HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 101
2021-04-08SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/08/2021; Senate Calendar 18
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-25HouseOught to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-152 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 14
2021-02-25HouseAmendment # 2021-0268h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 14
2021-02-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0268h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 26
2021-02-03HouseExecutive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/26/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=383&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB194
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=378&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=378
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&v=SP&id=378
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=46&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0194&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB194&ddlsponsors=&lsr=383
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=294&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0194&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB194&ddlsponsors=&lsr=383
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=46&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0194&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB194&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0383
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=294&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0194&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB194&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0383

Bill Comments 750

feedback