NH HB192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Lay on Table (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted DV 220-116 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Lay on Table (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted DV 220-116 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishing fluoridation in water.
Title
Abolishing fluoridation in water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted DV 220-116 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 63 |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Grassie) 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 16-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11 |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 40 |