NH HB189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 191-168; House Journal 20, PG. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 191-168; House Journal 20, PG. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authorization of payments by the treasurer from the Rockingham county delegation budget.
Title
Relative to authorization of payments by the treasurer from the Rockingham county delegation budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Mary Griffin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 191-168; House Journal 20, PG. 520 |
2015-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 248 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/3/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-28 | House | ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/5/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:20 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:20 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 211 |