NH HB187 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Law Without Signature 08/11/2021; Chapter 211; Eff: 08/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Law Without Signature 08/11/2021; Chapter 211; Eff: 08/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the emergency powers of the commissioner of health and human services and relative to the membership of the oversight committee on health and human services.
Title
Relative to the emergency powers of the commissioner of health and human services and relative to the membership of the oversight committee on health and human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 333 N: 6 NV: 26 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 333 N: 6 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 333 N: 6 NV: 31 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Law Without Signature 08/11/2021; Chapter 211; Eff: 08/11/2021 |
2021-07-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-2036c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-2036c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-2036c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/17/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-06-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-06-10 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/14/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gray, Bradley, Sherman; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-08 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. S. Pearson Replaces Rep. McGuire 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 53 |
2021-06-08 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Weber Replaces Rep. P. Schmidt 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 53 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1444s and Requests CofC (Reps. M. Pearson, Acton, McGuire, P. Schmidt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 51 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1444s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1444s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1444s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/05/2021, 09:30 am, on proposed amendment # 2021-1242s; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/05/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0952h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 22 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0952h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 22 |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0952h (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 12 |
2021-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2021 10:00 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/94033090497Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 65 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 333-6 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 65 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0161h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 65 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0161h (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 21 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96551569054 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 38 |