NH HB187 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 09/22/2013; Chapter 0244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 09/22/2013; Chapter 0244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to cost items in negotiated agreements.
Title
Relative to cost items in negotiated agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 09/22/2013; Chapter 0244 |
2013-06-13 | House | Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1648 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 187 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 187 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sen. Bragdon Moved to Remove HB 187 from the Consent Calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/27/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m. Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0060h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.330 |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendment #0060h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.330 |
2013-02-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0060h (New Title); House Calendar 13, PG.233 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0060h(NT) for Feb 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.210 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 12, PG.186 |