NH HB186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1598s and 2021-1696s and 2021-1707s (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted DV 194-167 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1598s and 2021-1696s and 2021-1707s (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted DV 194-167 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain legislative study commissions and committees.
Title
Relative to certain legislative study commissions and committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1598s and 2021-1696s and 2021-1707s (Rep. Hill): Motion Adopted DV 194-167 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2021-1598s, 2021-1696s, and 2021-1707s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2021-1707s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2021-1696s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1598s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 186 from the Consent Calendar; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1598s, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0869h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 40 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0869h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 40 |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0869h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 19 |
2021-03-17 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/29/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96696519759 |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97592045901Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/09/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97592045901 |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 38 |