NH HB186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a state minimum wage and providing for adjustments to the minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a state minimum wage and providing for adjustments to the minimum wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 210 N: 145 NV: 6 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 79 N: 274 NV: 8 Abs: 39) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-02SenateHearing: 05/09/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0723h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-145 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 22
2019-03-14HouseFLAM # 2019-1045h (Rep. Schultz): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 79-274 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 20
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0723h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 19
2019-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0723h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-02-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/20/2019 01:05 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback