NH HB186 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enabling the department of environmental services and the town of New Ipswich to negotiate an agreement regarding the encroachment of the town cemetery on state land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enabling the department of environmental services and the town of New Ipswich to negotiate an agreement regarding the encroachment of the town cemetery on state land.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 304
2015-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 176
2015-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 2/4/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-26House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-21House==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 211

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback