NH HB1822 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 205; I. Sections 4-7 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 205; I. Sections 4-7 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making hormonal contraceptives available directly from pharmacists by means of a standing order.
Title
Making hormonal contraceptives available directly from pharmacists by means of a standing order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - ITL (Y: 76 N: 265 NV: 24 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 205; I. Sections 4-7 eff. 1/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1947e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1947e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018 Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1118h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 21 |
2018-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-1118h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 21 |
2018-03-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-03-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1118h for 03/21/2018 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18 |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/14/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing: 03/14/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/13/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/06/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 50 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 50 |
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 76-265 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 48 |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 24 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 25 |