NH HB182 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB182
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Pending: House Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting discharge of volunteer firefighters or volunteer emergency medical technicians from other employment.
Title
Prohibiting discharge of volunteer firefighters or volunteer emergency medical technicians from other employment.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Mike Bordes [R] | Rep. Hope Damon [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |
Same As/Similar To
HB182 (Carry Over) 2023-06-07 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/23/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307