NH HB1816 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 309; RSA 126-A:5 XIX(i) as inserted by sec. 1 eff. 6/25/2018; II. Rem. eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 309; RSA 126-A:5 XIX(i) as inserted by sec. 1 eff. 6/25/2018; II. Rem. eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid managed care.
Title
Relative to Medicaid managed care.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 309; RSA 126-A:5 XIX(i) as inserted by sec. 1 eff. 6/25/2018; II. Rem. eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2089e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2089e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1770s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1770s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1770s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1770s, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1770s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0864h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 5 |
2018-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2018-0864h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 5 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0841h |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0864h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 69 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24 |