NH HB1811 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the New Hampshire health protection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the New Hampshire health protection program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - Interim Study (Y: 192 N: 154 NV: 19 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20HouseExecutive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
2018-02-08HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-154 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 45
2018-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-12-14HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback