NH HB181 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 302-52; House Journal 14, PG. 276-278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 302-52; House Journal 14, PG. 276-278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of "meeting" under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to the definition of "meeting" under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 302 N: 52 NV: 28 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 302-52; House Journal 14, PG. 276-278 |
2015-02-04 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep. Cali-Pitts); House Journal 14, PG. 174 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 4 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar10, PG. 151 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 1/22/2015 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 211 |