NH HB181 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the charter of a city, town, or school district which is in statute to revert to the control of the voters.
Title
Permitting the charter of a city, town, or school district which is in statute to revert to the control of the voters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Hearing: 4/19/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0104h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.313 | |
2011-02-09 | House Amendment #0104h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.313 | |
2011-02-01 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0104h; House Calendar 12, PG.227 | |
2011-02-01 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0104h for Feb 9 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.203-204 | |
2011-01-19 | House Executive Session: 1/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 11, PG. 175 |