NH HB1807 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 308; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to exploitation of elderly, disabled, or impaired adults and establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to exploitation of elderly, disabled, or impaired adults and establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Concur (Y: 171 N: 164 NV: 25 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 308; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2090e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-25SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2090e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1740s (Reps. Kotowski, Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-04-26SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1740s, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-26SenateSen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2018-1740s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18
2018-04-19SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-04-12SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 22
2018-02-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 12
2018-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-02-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 7
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 7
2018-01-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 9
2018-01-18HouseExecutive Session: 01/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-12-14HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback